MA H4916 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4894
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 312 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 312 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to real property tax deferrals in the town of Arlington
Title
Relative to real property tax deferrals in the town of Arlington
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 312 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-09-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-09-24 | House | New draft of H4894 |
2018-09-24 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4894 (Replaces) 2018-09-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4916
H4892 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2018
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4892 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2018
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4916 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4916.pdf |