MA H4892 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4364
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the city of Newton
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the city of Newton
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] |
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-08-03 | House | Enacted |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read third |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-27 | House | New draft of H4364 |
2020-07-27 | House | Pending new draft of H4364 |
2020-07-27 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4364 (Replaces) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4892
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4892.pdf |