MA H4877 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4285
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4969
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4969
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the proper bonding and grounding of CSST.
Title
Relative to the proper bonding and grounding of CSST.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill, H4969 |
2018-11-15 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2018-10-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-08-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-08-16 | House | New draft of H4285 |
2018-08-16 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4285 (Replaces) 2018-08-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4877
H4969 (Similar To) 2018-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4969 (Similar To) 2018-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4877 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4877.pdf |