MA H4864 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt the police department of the city of Framingham from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing certain positions from Massachusetts civil service law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-10-15HouseRules suspended
2020-10-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2020-08-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-07-31JointHearing scheduled for 08/03/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing
2020-07-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-07-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback