MA H4855 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4855). July 15, 2020.
Title
Authorizing the town of Plainfield to continue the employment of Fire Chief David Alvord
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-09-24 | House | Enacted |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-15 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-15 | House | Substituted for H4254 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4855 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4855.pdf |