MA H4848 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4999
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4999
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4999
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the maximum age requirement for original appointment as a police officer in the town of Dedham. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the maximum age requirement for original appointment as a police officer for the town of Dedham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4999 |
2022-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1744 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4999 (Replaced by) 2022-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2022
S2373 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S611 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4522 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2427 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1744 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4999 (Replaced by) 2022-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2022
S2373 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S611 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4522 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2427 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4848 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4848.pdf |