MA H4832 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4873
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4873
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4873
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the designation of certain park or open space land in the city of Holyoke. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding a parcel of land in Holyoke
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4873 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4873 (Replaced by) 2020-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4832 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4832.pdf |