MA H482 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint COVID-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting travel of persons from outside the Commonwealth. Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for freedom of commerce and personal travel within Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22JointHearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Covid-19 and Emergency Preparedness and Management

Same As/Similar To

S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
H1220 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2141 (Similar To) 2021-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H269 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1113 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2305 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2522
S1583 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S2242 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Senate concurred
S1585 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback