MA H4815 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Messrs. Crocker of Barnstable and Whelan of Brewster, a petition (subject to Joint Rules 12 and 7A) of William L. Crocker, Jr., and Timothy R. Whelan that Michael Cheung be authorized to purchase certain creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing Michael Cheung to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2020-10-13HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-08-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-08-24HouseRules suspended
2020-08-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-07-28HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/20/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing
2020-06-25SenateSenate concurred
2020-06-18HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2020-06-11HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback