MA H4789 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Chelsea be authorized to create a linkage fee for development in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the creation of a linkage fee for development in the city of Chelsea
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 232 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-09-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-09-26 | House | Enacted |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-06-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2022 from 09:00 AM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4534 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4788 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4534 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4788 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4789 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4789.pdf |