MA H4775 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4221). June 4, 2020.
Title
Authorizing the town of Shutesbury to convey certain land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-06-04 | House | Substituted for H4221 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4775 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4775.pdf |