MA H4773 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Ronald Friel, an employee of the Department of Disability Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Ronald Friel, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-29 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-12-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-12-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4773.pdf |