MA H4740 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Robert E. Hackett, an employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Robert Hackett, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-27 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-12-22 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-11-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-11-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2457 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1896 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2458 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4027
H331 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4592
H3433 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1896 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2458 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4027
H331 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4592
H3433 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4740 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4740.pdf |