MA H4737 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to safety and participation in the 2020 state elections in response to COVID-19. Election Laws.
Title
Ensuring safe and participatory 2020 state elections in response to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4762 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4762 (Replaced by) 2020-06-02 - New draft substituted, see H4768
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4737 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4737.pdf |