MA H4735 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waterways, wastewater, floods and other related matters
Title
Waterways, wastewater, floods and other related matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-07-15 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2024-07-15 | House | Accompanied by H744, H745, H747, H774, H806, H832, H834, H841, H842, H848, H856, H858, H867, H883, H885, H901 and H918 |
2024-07-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H744 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H745 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H747 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H774 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H806 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H832 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H834 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H841 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H842 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H848 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H856 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H858 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H867 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H883 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H885 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H901 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H918 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H4794 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4668 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4738 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4555 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reported, in part, by H868
H4852 (Similar To) 2024-09-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H745 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H747 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H774 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H806 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H832 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H834 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H841 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H842 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H848 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H856 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H858 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H867 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H883 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H885 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H901 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H918 (Replaces) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4735
H4794 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4668 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4738 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4555 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reported, in part, by H868
H4852 (Similar To) 2024-09-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4735.pdf |