MA H4720 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to zoning for flood insurance rate maps by cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency action on FEMA Flood Insurance Rate Maps

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-19JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2020-05-19JointHearing scheduled for 05/21/2020 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only
2020-05-19JointHearing scheduled for 05/21/2020 from 01:59 PM-02:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2020-05-14SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-11HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2020-05-07HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback