MA H4717 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Sabadosa of Northampton and Mark of Peru, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Lindsay N. Sabadosa and others that all persons who become unemployed as a result of COVID-19 have access to MassHealth coverage. Health Care Financing.
Title
Providing for a MassHealth expansion in response to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-03-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4717.pdf |