MA H4715 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recommending terms for certain bonds.
Title
Providing the terms of certain bonds to be issued by the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 388 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-11-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-11-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-11-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-11-17 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-11-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-10-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4715 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4715.pdf |