MA H469 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating telephone solicitation. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Clarifying telephone solicitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H516 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
H3355 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
H3355 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H469 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H469.pdf |