MA H4664 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting price gouging of goods, services and supplies during a declared public health emergency. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In relation to prohibiting price gouging with respect to goods, services and supplies during a declared public health emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-11HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday June 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-28JointHearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2020-04-17SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-09HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2020-03-30HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback