MA H4658 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5037
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to remote notarization during the COVID-19 state of emergency. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to remote notarization during COVID-19 state of emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5037 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2020-04-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5037 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4658 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4658.pdf |