MA H4652 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pretrial services during the COVID-19 declaration of emergency. The Judiciary.
Title
Regarding decarceration and COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2020-03-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4652 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4652.pdf |