MA H4648 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Wellfleet be authorized to establish a real estate transfer fee in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Wellfleet to establish a real estate transfer fee
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/15/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4567 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4295 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4647 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5349
H5087 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5338
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3966 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4567 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4295 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4647 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5349
H5087 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5338
H2942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3966 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4648 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4648.pdf |