MA H4636 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Woburn be authorized to use certain land in said city for fire station purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Woburn to use certain land for fire station purposes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-05-21HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-05-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-05-07HouseRules suspended
2020-05-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-04-29HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-04-16SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-15HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback