MA H4625 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4713

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-6)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to expand unemployment insurance benefits to certain employees due to the COVID-19 emergency declaration. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to COVID-19 emergency unemployment insurance expansion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4713
2020-04-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2020-03-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4713 (Replaced by) 2020-05-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback