MA H4623 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to absentee voting for the 2020 state primary and general elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the 2020 state primary and general election

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws
2020-03-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback