MA H4618 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to polling places in the city of Attleboro. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to polling places in the city of Attleboro
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-11 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-07-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H364 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H352 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H382 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2896 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H359 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H352 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H382 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2896 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H359 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4618.pdf |