MA H4606 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S834

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-11)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for the crime of female genital mutilation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the penalties for the crime of female genital mutilation

Sponsors

Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-02-06HouseNew draft of S834, H1466 and H3332
2020-02-06HouseReported from the committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S834 (Replaces) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4606

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback