MA H4599 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5037
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of recreation vehicles in the city of Springfield. The Judiciary. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the use of recreation vehicles in the city of Springfield
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Sen. James Welch [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5037 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-26 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/13/2020 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H5037 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4599.pdf |