MA H4593 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4356
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Amherst to continue the employment of Walter (Tim) Nelson
Title
Authorizing the town of Amherst to continue the employment of Walter (Tim) Nelson
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-04-26 | House | Enacted |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-04-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-04-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-04 | House | New draft of H4356 |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4356 (Replaces) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4593
H2563 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H2564 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H2563 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3854
H2564 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4593 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4593.pdf |