MA H4588 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of North Attleborough be authorized to grant two additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises and one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of North Attleborough to issue three (3) additional liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4990 |
2020-09-10 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2020-09-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-09-10 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-04-16 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2020 from 04:00 PM-04:05 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2020 from 04:00 PM-04:05 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4990 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4588 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4588.pdf |