MA H4574 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Malden be authorized to continue to employ and compensate Barbara O’Brien. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City of Malden to continue the employment of Barbara O’Brien
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1043 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1041 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2110
H91 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1478 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1010 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2689 (Similar To) 2018-12-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/26/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1041 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2110
H91 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1478 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1010 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2689 (Similar To) 2018-12-24 - Hearing scheduled for 12/26/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4574 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4574.pdf |