MA H4566 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to employment protections for domestic violence victims. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-30HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-12SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-26HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2020-02-20HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback