MA H4559 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to amending the charter of the town of Scituate. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Scituate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2025-01-08 | House | Amendment #1 (Walsh) adopted |
2024-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2024-12-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-12-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-10-07 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-10-03 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2024-06-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-06-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-05-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-18 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
H4847 (Similar To) 2025-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2025
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-10-17 - Amended by substitution of bill, see H5076
H5004 (Similar To) 2025-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 401 of the Acts of 2024
H5076 (Similar To) 2025-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 397 of the Acts of 2024
H4847 (Similar To) 2025-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2025
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-10-17 - Amended by substitution of bill, see H5076
H5004 (Similar To) 2025-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 401 of the Acts of 2024
H5076 (Similar To) 2025-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 397 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4559 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4559.pdf |