MA H4538 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1747

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-17)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce harm from opioids

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce harm from opioids

Sponsors

Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]
Rep. Paul Frost [R]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Donald Wong [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-09HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-03-09HouseNew draft of H1747
2020-03-09HouseReported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H1747 (Replaces) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback