MA H4531 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 480 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 480 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the Milford Water Company. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Milford Water Company
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 480 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-11-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-11-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-11-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-11-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2014-09-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4531 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4531.pdf |