MA H4511 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4030
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to streamlining licensure, compliance, and contracting opportunities
Title
Relative to streamlining licensure, compliance, and contracting opportunities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | House | New draft of H4030 |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4030 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4511
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S2243 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H3378
S1244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S2243 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H3378
S1244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4511 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4511.pdf |