MA H4503 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1935
Note: Legislation replaced by S2594

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-8)
Status: Passed on April 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to strengthening the local and regional public health system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to strengthening the local and regional public health system

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 152 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-29 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2020
2020-04-23SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-04-23HouseEnacted
2020-04-23SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-04-23HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred in the House further amendment
2020-04-23SenateRules suspended
2020-04-23HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 4671
2020-03-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-03-18SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-03-18SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-03-18SenateNew draft substituted, see S2594
2020-03-18SenateRead second
2020-03-18SenateRules suspended
2020-03-18SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2020-03-12SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof a new text, see S2594 and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2020-02-27SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-02-26HousePassed to be engrossed - 149 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No.152)
2020-02-26HouseRead third
2020-02-26HouseRules suspended
2020-02-26HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-26HouseNew draft of H1935
2020-02-26HousePending new draft of H1935
2020-02-26HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H1935 (Replaces) 2020-02-26 - New draft substituted, see H4503
S2594 (Replaced by) 2020-03-18 - See H4503

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback