MA H448 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4642

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to student data privacy. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to student data privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-16HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4642
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday March 5, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H3148 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S295 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H4642 (Replaced by) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback