MA H4443 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1880

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-24HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-02-24HouseNew draft of H1880
2020-02-24HouseReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1880 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4443

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback