MA H4442 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the city of Marlborough to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Marlborough to grant additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4621 |
2018-06-11 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2018-06-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-11 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2018-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1666 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H2782 (Similar To) 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2017
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4621 (Replaced by) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 306 of the Acts of 2018
H2782 (Similar To) 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2017
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4621 (Replaced by) 2018-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 306 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4442 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4442.pdf |