MA H4435 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Whelan of Brewster, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 7A) of Timothy R. Whelan that Barnstable county retirement board shall permit Jeremiah Z. Valli, a member of the Barnstable county retirement system, to purchase creditable service for military service. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing Jeremiah Z. Valli to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-07-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2021-08-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4435 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4435.pdf |