MA H4409 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4891
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4891
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4891
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Ryan of Boston, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Daniel J. Ryan, RoseLee Vincent and Sal N. DiDomenico that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey certain parcels of land to the city of Chelsea for conservation and passive recreational purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Chelsea
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4891 |
2020-05-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-05-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-05-21 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4891 (Replaced by) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 274 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4409 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4409.pdf |