MA H4390 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Kingston be authorized to establish a special fund to process activity produced by non-town net metering. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of Kingston to establish a Special Fund to process activity produced by Non-Town Net Metering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5082 |
2020-10-29 | House | Read third |
2020-08-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-08-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-08-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4390 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4390.pdf |