MA H4384 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H369
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 477 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 477 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sterilization of musical instruments in schools
Title
Relative to the sterilization of musical instruments in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 477 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Amendment (Tarr) adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Senate Rule 49 suspended |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Objection made (Donnelly) |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2014-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-12-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-08-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-31 | House | New draft of H369 |
2014-07-31 | House | Pending new draft of H369 |
2014-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H369 (Replaces) 2014-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4384
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4384 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4384.pdf |