MA H4380 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4470
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-6)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the treatment of substance use disorders. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To improve substance use disorder treatment in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4470 |
2018-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2018 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H4470 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4725
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H4470 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4725
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4380 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4380.pdf |