MA H4365 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4644
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lunenburg be authorized to grant one additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises to Lanni Orchards. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of Lunenburg to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages on the premises to Lanni Orchards
Sponsors
Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4644 |
2020-02-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/19/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4644 (Replaced by) 2020-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4365 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4365.pdf |