MA H4360 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Hunt of Sandwich, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Randy Hunt that a certain bridge in the town of Sandwich on state Route 6A be designated as the Commander Francis T. Williams and Sandwich veterans memorial bridge. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a certain bridge in the town of Sandwich as the Commander Francis T. Williams & Sandwich Veterans Memorial Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-24HouseRules suspended
2020-02-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-18HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-02-03SenateSenate concurred
2019-10-03HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback