MA H4347 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Carlisle be authorized to assess fines to utility companies which fail to relocate utility wires, cables and attachments which it is responsible for in said town. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Carlisle to assess fines for failure to relocate or remove utility poles and wires
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4347 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4347.pdf |