MA H4345 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Carlisle be authorized to recall elected officials of said town. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the recall of elected officials in the town of Carlisle
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4345 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4345.pdf |